|
07/06/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 37, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 46. Noes 27. Page 5745.)
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 19 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 8. Page 3943.)
|
|
|
|
05/27/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2010
|
From inactive file. To second reading. Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2009
|
To inactive file on motion of Senator Florez.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2009
|
Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (July 7).
|
|
|
|
07/01/2009
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2009
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 46. Noes 31. Page 2053.)
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
Read third time, amended, and returned to third reading. (Ayes 48. Noes 29. Page 1924.).
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 5.) (May 20).
|
|
|
|
04/30/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2009
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 5.) (April 27).
|
|
|
|
04/02/2009
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|