LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1500
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1500
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1500
Compare Versions
AB1500 Chaptered July 6, 2010
AB1500 Enrolled June 22, 2010
AB1500 Amended May 26, 2010
AB1500 Amended July 14, 2009
AB1500 Amended June 2, 2009
AB1500 Amended April 29, 2009
AB1500 Introduced February 27, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
AB1500 Chaptered July 6, 2010
AB1500 Enrolled June 22, 2010
AB1500 Amended May 26, 2010
AB1500 Amended July 14, 2009
AB1500 Amended June 2, 2009
AB1500 Amended April 29, 2009
AB1500 Introduced February 27, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare