California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1502 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2009

Enrolled

Bill August 19, 2010

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2010

Amended

Bill June 16, 2010
Bill February 24, 2010
Bill January 4, 2010