LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1502
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1502
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1502
Compare Versions
AB1502 Chaptered September 30, 2010
AB1502 Enrolled August 19, 2010
AB1502 Amended June 16, 2010
AB1502 Amended February 24, 2010
AB1502 Amended January 4, 2010
AB1502 Introduced February 27, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
AB1502 Chaptered September 30, 2010
AB1502 Enrolled August 19, 2010
AB1502 Amended June 16, 2010
AB1502 Amended February 24, 2010
AB1502 Amended January 4, 2010
AB1502 Introduced February 27, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare