|
07/15/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 77, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2010
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 75. Noes 2. Page 5920.)
|
|
|
|
06/28/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4093.)
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2010
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
01/28/2010
|
From inactive file. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2009
|
To inactive file on motion of Senator DeSaulnier.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2009
|
Read third time. Urgency clause refused adoption. Passage refused in Senate. (Ayes 24. Noes 2. Page 2347.) Motion to reconsider made by Senator DeSaulnier. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2347.)
|
|
|
|
08/19/2009
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended.
|
|
|
|
07/20/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
07/08/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 3. Noes 1.) (July 7).
|
|
|
|
06/17/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., R., & C.A.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2009
|
Referred to Com. on E., R., & C.A.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1619.)
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 1.) (May 13).
|
|
|
|
04/29/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2009
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 21).
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
|
04/02/2009
|
Referred to Com. on E. & R. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended. (Corrected April 3.)
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|