LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1514
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1514
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1514
Compare Versions
AB1514 Chaptered July 15, 2010
AB1514 Enrolled July 2, 2010
AB1514 Amended May 27, 2010
AB1514 Amended August 26, 2009
AB1514 Amended August 19, 2009
AB1514 Amended June 17, 2009
AB1514 Amended April 28, 2009
AB1514 Amended April 2, 2009
AB1514 Introduced February 27, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
AB1514 Chaptered July 15, 2010
AB1514 Enrolled July 2, 2010
AB1514 Amended May 27, 2010
AB1514 Amended August 26, 2009
AB1514 Amended August 19, 2009
AB1514 Amended June 17, 2009
AB1514 Amended April 28, 2009
AB1514 Amended April 2, 2009
AB1514 Introduced February 27, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare