|
09/24/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 226, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/23/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/15/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 4:45 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2010
|
Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 62. Noes 10. Page 6902.)
|
|
|
|
08/30/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed and to Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 6. Page 5020.)
|
|
|
|
08/27/2010
|
Joint Rules 61(b)(15) and 62(a) suspended. (Ayes 27. Noes 7. Page 4959.) Senate Rule 29.3(b) suspended. (Ayes 21. Noes 11. Page 4960.) From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (August 27).
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. Joint Rules 61(b)(15) and 62(a) suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 4589.) From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (August 18).
|
|
|
|
08/12/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (June 29).
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2009
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 16. Page 1353.)
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (April 29).
|
|
|
|
04/14/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (April 14).
|
|
|
|
03/24/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (March 23).
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
01/26/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 25. Read first time.
|
|
|
|
01/23/2009
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|