LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB153
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB153
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB153
Compare Versions
AB153 Chaptered September 24, 2010
AB153 Enrolled September 13, 2010
AB153 Amended August 30, 2010
AB153 Amended August 12, 2010
AB153 Amended June 21, 2010
AB153 Introduced January 23, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
AB153 Chaptered September 24, 2010
AB153 Enrolled September 13, 2010
AB153 Amended August 30, 2010
AB153 Amended August 12, 2010
AB153 Amended June 21, 2010
AB153 Introduced January 23, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare