|
08/24/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 2. Page 4816.)
|
|
|
|
08/04/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/03/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 0.) (June 23).
|
|
|
|
06/14/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2009
|
Referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 47. Noes 29. Page 1886.)
|
|
|
|
05/29/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 28). Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (April 27).
|
|
|
|
04/21/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/02/2009
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|