California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1530 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2009

Enrolled

Bill September 10, 2010

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2010

Amended

Bill June 30, 2010
Bill June 14, 2010
Bill June 1, 2010
Bill April 20, 2009