|
06/03/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
|
01/11/2010
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
01/07/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
|
12/17/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
10/14/2009
|
Senate Rule 29.3 suspended. (Page 2527.) From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Senate Rule 29.3 suspended. (Ayes 23. Noes 14. Page 2280.) From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C. Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2009
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2009
|
Referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1754.)
|
|
|
|
05/26/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 20).
|
|
|
|
05/07/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2009
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 27).
|
|
|
|
04/21/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Re-referred. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 20).
|
|
|
|
04/16/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on U. & C. and NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|