California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1536 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2009

Amended

Bill June 3, 2010
Bill December 17, 2009
Bill October 14, 2009
Bill September 10, 2009
Bill September 8, 2009
Bill September 2, 2009
Bill June 23, 2009
Bill May 6, 2009
Bill April 14, 2009