|
07/02/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 10, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2009
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 6:10 p.m.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2009
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2314.)
|
|
|
|
06/28/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2009
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1500.)
|
|
|
|
06/23/2009
|
Read second time, amended, and to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 17).
|
|
|
|
06/11/2009
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1997.)
|
|
|
|
05/29/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (May 28). Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (May 12).
|
|
|
|
05/07/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/02/2009
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
03/05/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee April 4.
|
|
|
|
03/04/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|