LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1543
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1543
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1543
Compare Versions
AB1543 Chaptered July 2, 2009
AB1543 Enrolled June 30, 2009
AB1543 Amended June 23, 2009
AB1543 Amended June 11, 2009
AB1543 Amended May 21, 2009
AB1543 Amended May 6, 2009
AB1543 Amended April 20, 2009
AB1543 Introduced March 4, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
AB1543 Chaptered July 2, 2009
AB1543 Enrolled June 30, 2009
AB1543 Amended June 23, 2009
AB1543 Amended June 11, 2009
AB1543 Amended May 21, 2009
AB1543 Amended May 6, 2009
AB1543 Amended April 20, 2009
AB1543 Introduced March 4, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare