California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1544 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 4, 2009

Enrolled

Bill September 17, 2009

Chaptered

Bill October 11, 2009

Amended

Bill September 4, 2009
Bill August 17, 2009
Bill July 23, 2009