LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1544
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1544
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1544
Compare Versions
AB1544 Chaptered October 11, 2009
AB1544 Enrolled September 17, 2009
AB1544 Amended September 4, 2009
AB1544 Amended August 17, 2009
AB1544 Amended July 23, 2009
AB1544 Introduced March 4, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
AB1544 Chaptered October 11, 2009
AB1544 Enrolled September 17, 2009
AB1544 Amended September 4, 2009
AB1544 Amended August 17, 2009
AB1544 Amended July 23, 2009
AB1544 Introduced March 4, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare