|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 300, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2009
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 68. Noes 6. Page 3271.)
|
|
|
|
09/09/2009
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice waived. (Page 3152.) From committee: With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (September 9).
|
|
|
|
09/04/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on U. & C. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 5 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 2103.)
|
|
|
|
08/19/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 17).
|
|
|
|
07/23/2009
|
Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/16/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 7).
|
|
|
|
06/30/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2009
|
Referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1558.)
|
|
|
|
05/13/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (May 11).
|
|
|
|
04/20/2009
|
Referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
|
03/11/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee April 11.
|
|
|
|
03/10/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|