California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1553 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 10, 2009

Enrolled

Bill September 16, 2009

Chaptered

Bill October 11, 2009

Amended

Bill July 23, 2009
Bill June 30, 2009