|
08/23/2010
|
To inactive file on motion of Senator Lowenthal.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/12/2010
|
Withdrawn from committee. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2010
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
02/04/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
|
|
|
|
09/04/2009
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2009
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended.
|
|
|
|
07/08/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 7).
|
|
|
|
06/30/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2009
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 1471.)
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (May 6).
|
|
|
|
04/21/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 21).
|
|
|
|
04/02/2009
|
Referred to Com. on J.,E.D., & E.
|
|
|
|
03/23/2009
|
(Corrected March 20.)
|
|
|
|
03/12/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee April 11.
|
|
|
|
03/11/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|