California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1554 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 11, 2009

Amended

Bill August 5, 2010
Bill September 4, 2009
Bill August 19, 2009
Bill June 30, 2009