|
09/27/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 341, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6627.)
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6558.) Passed on file.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 25 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4772.)
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 1).
|
|
|
|
06/22/2010
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
07/08/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2009
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1997.)
|
|
|
|
05/29/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (May 28). Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2009
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 18).
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
03/24/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
01/27/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 26.
|
|
|
|
01/26/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|