LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB157
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB157
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB157
Compare Versions
AB157 Chaptered September 27, 2010
AB157 Enrolled August 31, 2010
AB157 Amended August 17, 2010
AB157 Amended June 22, 2010
AB157 Amended May 20, 2009
AB157 Amended March 24, 2009
AB157 Amended March 2, 2009
AB157 Introduced January 26, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
AB157 Chaptered September 27, 2010
AB157 Enrolled August 31, 2010
AB157 Amended August 17, 2010
AB157 Amended June 22, 2010
AB157 Amended May 20, 2009
AB157 Amended March 24, 2009
AB157 Amended March 2, 2009
AB157 Introduced January 26, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare