|
02/26/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 7, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 3:15 p.m.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2010
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 4045.)
|
|
|
|
02/11/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after February 13 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
02/11/2010
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed and to Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 2797.)
|
|
|
|
02/09/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
02/08/2010
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
01/19/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
01/12/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (January 12).
|
|
|
|
01/06/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
09/04/2009
|
Referred to Com. on G.O. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed and to Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2923.)
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 27). Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice waived. (Page 2738.)
|
|
|
|
08/24/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (August 24).
|
|
|
|
07/13/2009
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
|
07/10/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee August 9.
|
|
|
|
07/09/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|