LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1585
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1585
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1585
Compare Versions
AB1585 Chaptered February 26, 2010
AB1585 Enrolled February 18, 2010
AB1585 Amended February 8, 2010
AB1585 Amended January 6, 2010
AB1585 Amended September 4, 2009
AB1585 Introduced July 9, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
AB1585 Chaptered February 26, 2010
AB1585 Enrolled February 18, 2010
AB1585 Amended February 8, 2010
AB1585 Amended January 6, 2010
AB1585 Amended September 4, 2009
AB1585 Introduced July 9, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare