|
09/30/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 572, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 4:45 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6373.) Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6380.)
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 20 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4604.)
|
|
|
|
08/12/2010
|
Ordered to Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/24/2010
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Re-referred. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 22). From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2010
|
Re-referred to Coms. on JUD. and PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 4547.)
|
|
|
|
03/25/2010
|
Withdrawn from committee. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
03/24/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/23/2010
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (March 16).
|
|
|
|
03/08/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
03/04/2010
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2010
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
01/14/2010
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
01/05/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 4.
|
|
|
|
01/04/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|