California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1596 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 4, 2010

Amended

Bill June 23, 2010
Bill May 19, 2010
Bill March 23, 2010
Bill March 4, 2010