|
09/24/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 234, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/23/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 2:50 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/11/2010
|
In Assembly. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/11/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 2. Page 4455.)
|
|
|
|
08/04/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/03/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 2).
|
|
|
|
07/01/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 30).
|
|
|
|
05/27/2010
|
Referred to Com. on B., F. & I.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 3. Page 5128.)
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 2.) (April 28).
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2010
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 7).
|
|
|
|
03/09/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
|
03/08/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
01/14/2010
|
Referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
|
01/05/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 4.
|
|
|
|
01/04/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|