LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1597
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1597
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1597
Compare Versions
AB1597 Chaptered September 24, 2010
AB1597 Enrolled August 12, 2010
AB1597 Amended April 13, 2010
AB1597 Amended March 8, 2010
AB1597 Introduced January 4, 2010
Version 1 (Old)
AB1597 Chaptered September 24, 2010
AB1597 Enrolled August 12, 2010
AB1597 Amended April 13, 2010
AB1597 Amended March 8, 2010
AB1597 Introduced January 4, 2010
Version 2 (New)
Compare