|
09/30/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 655, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 4:20 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 27 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6668.) Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 51. Noes 27. Page 6668.)
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 21. Noes 13. Page 4841.)
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 4.) (August 12).
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR suspense file. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 30).
|
|
|
|
06/24/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 49. Noes 26. Page 5396.)
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 28). Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2010
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 5069.)
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (April 20).
|
|
|
|
04/19/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
01/06/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 5.
|
|
|
|
01/05/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|