California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1602 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 5, 2010

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2010

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2010

Amended

Bill August 20, 2010
Bill August 17, 2010
Bill August 2, 2010
Bill June 24, 2010
Bill April 15, 2010
Bill April 8, 2010