|
09/30/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 665, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 4:45 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 50. Noes 27. Page 6373.) Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 48. Noes 29. Page 6401.)
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 20 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 21. Noes 13. Page 4580.)
|
|
|
|
08/10/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 3. Noes 2.) (June 30).
|
|
|
|
06/28/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
06/24/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 22).
|
|
|
|
05/27/2010
|
Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and RLS.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 46. Noes 26. Page 5156.)
|
|
|
|
05/11/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (May 5).
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2010
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 12).
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on RULES by unanimous consent.
|
|
|
|
04/06/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
01/21/2010
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
01/12/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 11.
|
|
|
|
01/11/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|