California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1641 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 11, 2010

Enrolled

Bill August 24, 2010

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2010

Amended

Bill August 9, 2010
Bill July 1, 2010
Bill June 24, 2010
Bill May 11, 2010
Bill April 5, 2010
Bill February 24, 2010