|
08/27/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 189, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 4:55 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6089.)
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 7 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 4371.)
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (June 29).
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Re-referred. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 22).
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on V.A.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
Referred to Coms. on V.A. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 4792.)
|
|
|
|
04/15/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 13).
|
|
|
|
04/07/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on V.A.
|
|
|
|
04/06/2010
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on V.A. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 23).
|
|
|
|
03/18/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
03/17/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/08/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/04/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD. by unanimous consent, and then be re-referred to Com. on V.A.
|
|
|
|
01/13/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 12.
|
|
|
|
01/12/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|