LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1644
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1644
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1644
Compare Versions
AB1644 Chaptered August 27, 2010
AB1644 Enrolled August 12, 2010
AB1644 Amended August 2, 2010
AB1644 Amended June 2, 2010
AB1644 Amended April 6, 2010
AB1644 Amended March 17, 2010
AB1644 Amended March 11, 2010
AB1644 Introduced January 12, 2010
Version 1 (Old)
AB1644 Chaptered August 27, 2010
AB1644 Enrolled August 12, 2010
AB1644 Amended August 2, 2010
AB1644 Amended June 2, 2010
AB1644 Amended April 6, 2010
AB1644 Amended March 17, 2010
AB1644 Amended March 11, 2010
AB1644 Introduced January 12, 2010
Version 2 (New)
Compare