California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1648 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 13, 2010

Enrolled

Bill September 3, 2010

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2010

Amended

Bill August 20, 2010
Bill July 15, 2010
Bill May 24, 2010
Bill May 3, 2010
Bill April 14, 2010
Bill April 6, 2010