LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1648
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1648
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1648
Compare Versions
AB1648 Chaptered September 27, 2010
AB1648 Enrolled September 3, 2010
AB1648 Amended August 20, 2010
AB1648 Amended July 15, 2010
AB1648 Amended May 24, 2010
AB1648 Amended May 3, 2010
AB1648 Amended April 14, 2010
AB1648 Amended April 6, 2010
AB1648 Introduced January 13, 2010
Version 1 (Old)
AB1648 Chaptered September 27, 2010
AB1648 Enrolled September 3, 2010
AB1648 Amended August 20, 2010
AB1648 Amended July 15, 2010
AB1648 Amended May 24, 2010
AB1648 Amended May 3, 2010
AB1648 Amended April 14, 2010
AB1648 Amended April 6, 2010
AB1648 Introduced January 13, 2010
Version 2 (New)
Compare