|
07/15/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 80, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2010
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5923.)
|
|
|
|
06/28/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 4101.)
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
Ordered to Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 16).
|
|
|
|
06/09/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2010
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5145.)
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 5).
|
|
|
|
03/25/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
03/24/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/11/2010
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 11).
|
|
|
|
03/04/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on RULES by unanimous consent.
|
|
|
|
03/03/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
01/27/2010
|
Referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
|
01/21/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 20.
|
|
|
|
01/20/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|