California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1666 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 20, 2010

Enrolled

Bill July 2, 2010

Chaptered

Bill July 15, 2010

Amended

Bill June 9, 2010
Bill March 24, 2010
Bill March 2, 2010