|
08/27/2010
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 4:55 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
In Assembly. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4410.)
|
|
|
|
08/04/2010
|
Ordered to Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/03/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 30).
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 0. Page 5251.)
|
|
|
|
05/17/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 12).
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 21).
|
|
|
|
04/13/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/07/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Further hearing to be set.
|
|
|
|
01/21/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 20.
|
|
|
|
01/20/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|