California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1671 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 08/12/2010

 BILL NUMBER: AB 1671ENROLLED BILL TEXT PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 9, 2010 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY MAY 20, 2010 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 17, 2010 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 12, 2010 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 10, 2010 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 2, 2010 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Jeffries JANUARY 20, 2010 An act to amend Section 25060 of the Government Code, relating to county government. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1671, Jeffries. County board of supervisors: vacancy: appointment. Existing law requires the Governor to fill a vacancy on any county board of supervisors. This bill would require the Governor to fill the vacancy within 90 days, and if the Governor fails to act within 90 days, the bill would authorize the board of supervisors, within the next 90 days, to appoint an individual to fill the vacancy, call a special election to fill the vacancy, or leave the vacancy open until the next regularly scheduled general election, as provided. The bill would provide that if the Governor and board of supervisors both fail to act, then the vacancy shall remain open until the next regular election at which time a successor may be elected. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 25060 of the Government Code is amended to read: 25060. (a) Whenever a vacancy occurs in any board of supervisors, the Governor shall fill the vacancy within 90 days. (b) If the Governor fails to act within 90 days pursuant to subdivision (a), the board of supervisors shall, within 90 days, do one of the following: (1) Appoint an individual, by vote of a quorum of the board, to fill the vacancy. (2) Vote, by a quorum of the board, to call a special election to fill the vacancy. (3) Vote, by a quorum of the board, to leave the seat vacant until the next regularly scheduled election. (c) If the Governor fails to act within 90 days pursuant to subdivision (a) and the board of supervisors fails to act within 90 days pursuant to subdivision (b), then the vacancy shall remain open until the next regular election at which time a successor may be elected. (d) Any person appointed or elected shall hold office until the election and qualification of his or her successor pursuant to Section 25061.