LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1676
Draft Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1676
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1676
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
January 21, 2010
Compare
Amended
Bill
August 18, 2010
Compare
Bill
August 2, 2010
Compare
Bill
June 24, 2010
Compare
Bill
June 1, 2010
Compare
Bill
May 6, 2010
Compare
Bill
April 27, 2010
Compare
Bill
March 24, 2010
Compare