LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1676
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1676
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1676
Compare Versions
AB1676 Amended August 18, 2010
AB1676 Amended August 2, 2010
AB1676 Amended June 24, 2010
AB1676 Amended June 1, 2010
AB1676 Amended May 6, 2010
AB1676 Amended April 27, 2010
AB1676 Amended March 24, 2010
AB1676 Introduced January 21, 2010
Version 1 (Old)
AB1676 Amended August 18, 2010
AB1676 Amended August 2, 2010
AB1676 Amended June 24, 2010
AB1676 Amended June 1, 2010
AB1676 Amended May 6, 2010
AB1676 Amended April 27, 2010
AB1676 Amended March 24, 2010
AB1676 Introduced January 21, 2010
Version 2 (New)
Compare