California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1695 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 28, 2010

Enrolled

Bill August 16, 2010

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2010

Amended

Bill July 1, 2010
Bill February 24, 2010