LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1695
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1695
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1695
Compare Versions
AB1695 Chaptered September 30, 2010
AB1695 Enrolled August 16, 2010
AB1695 Amended July 1, 2010
AB1695 Amended February 24, 2010
AB1695 Introduced January 28, 2010
Version 1 (Old)
AB1695 Chaptered September 30, 2010
AB1695 Enrolled August 16, 2010
AB1695 Amended July 1, 2010
AB1695 Amended February 24, 2010
AB1695 Introduced January 28, 2010
Version 2 (New)
Compare