California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1742 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 8, 2010

Enrolled

Bill August 4, 2010

Chaptered

Bill August 17, 2010

Amended

Bill June 17, 2010
Bill March 15, 2010
Bill February 24, 2010