LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1742
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1742
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1742
Compare Versions
AB1742 Chaptered August 17, 2010
AB1742 Enrolled August 4, 2010
AB1742 Amended June 17, 2010
AB1742 Amended March 15, 2010
AB1742 Amended February 24, 2010
AB1742 Introduced February 8, 2010
Version 1 (Old)
AB1742 Chaptered August 17, 2010
AB1742 Enrolled August 4, 2010
AB1742 Amended June 17, 2010
AB1742 Amended March 15, 2010
AB1742 Amended February 24, 2010
AB1742 Introduced February 8, 2010
Version 2 (New)
Compare