|
08/18/2010
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 4:15 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
In Assembly. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 3. Page 4307.)
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 28).
|
|
|
|
06/15/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 14).
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2010
|
Referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5154.)
|
|
|
|
05/11/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 3.) (May 5).
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 13).
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
|
04/07/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2010
|
Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
|
02/12/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 14.
|
|
|
|
02/11/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|