LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1824
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1824
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1824
Compare Versions
AB1824 Enrolled August 4, 2010
AB1824 Amended May 11, 2010
AB1824 Amended April 20, 2010
AB1824 Amended April 7, 2010
AB1824 Introduced February 11, 2010
Version 1 (Old)
AB1824 Enrolled August 4, 2010
AB1824 Amended May 11, 2010
AB1824 Amended April 20, 2010
AB1824 Amended April 7, 2010
AB1824 Introduced February 11, 2010
Version 2 (New)
Compare