|
03/25/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 12, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 6 p.m.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after March 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 4362.) Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 67. Noes 2. Page 4362.)
|
|
|
|
03/22/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (March 22). Ordered to third reading. Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 1. Page 2981.)
|
|
|
|
03/18/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. (Corrected March 23.)
|
|
|
|
03/17/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
09/04/2009
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2009
|
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered placed on second reading file.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 0. Page 1224.)
|
|
|
|
03/31/2009
|
Referred to Com. on BUDGET.
|
|
|
|
02/03/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 5.
|
|
|
|
02/02/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|