LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB183
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB183
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB183
Compare Versions
AB183 Chaptered March 25, 2010
AB183 Enrolled March 22, 2010
AB183 Amended March 18, 2010
AB183 Amended September 4, 2009
AB183 Introduced February 2, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
AB183 Chaptered March 25, 2010
AB183 Enrolled March 22, 2010
AB183 Amended March 18, 2010
AB183 Amended September 4, 2009
AB183 Introduced February 2, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare